Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Vehicle Laws – Towing – Clearing and Disposal of Debris
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 /CH0560 (SB0731/CH0561)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 /CH0584 (SB0750/CH0585)
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0417
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612
Title
Street Racing and Exhibition Driving - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 /CH0561 (HB0870/CH0560)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0585 (HB1081/CH0584)
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0198 Vehicle Laws – Towing – Clearing and Disposal of Debris Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Delegate Foley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0870 /CH0560 (SB0731/CH0561) Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification Delegate Foley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 560
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1081 /CH0584 (SB0750/CH0585) Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing Delegate Boyce 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0146 /CH0417 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0612 Street Racing and Exhibition Driving - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties Senator Beidle 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0731 /CH0561 (HB0870/CH0560) Vehicle Towing or Removal - Secured Parties - Electronic Notification Senator Watson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 /CH0585 (HB1081/CH0584) Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing Senator McCray 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page