Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Transfer Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342
Title
State Transfer Tax - Rates and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625
Title
Real Property - Transfer-on-Death Deed - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Baltimore County - Transfer Tax - Exemption for First-Time Home Buyers
Sponsor
Delegate Long, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410
Title
State Transfer Tax - Exemption for First-Time Home Buyers - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 (SB0582)
Title
Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB1428)
Title
Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0342 State Transfer Tax - Rates and Distribution of Revenue Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0625 Real Property - Transfer-on-Death Deed - Establishment Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1295 Baltimore County - Transfer Tax - Exemption for First-Time Home Buyers Delegate Long, R. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1410 State Transfer Tax - Exemption for First-Time Home Buyers - Alterations Delegate Long, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 (SB0582) Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0582 (HB1428) Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Senator Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/3/2025 5:10 PM
Click to return on the top page