Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Transient Merchants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0414
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Market Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0280
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0600 /CH0414 Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Market Permit - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0226 /CH0280 Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page