Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Trials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0454)
Title
Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0159)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Prosecution of Police Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536 (SB0416)
Title
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 (SB0629)
Title
Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0669)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1049
Title
Police Qualified Immunity and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378
Title
Forensic Analysis - Letter of Exception - Criminal Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0281)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0536)
Title
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0052)
Title
Real Property – Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Creditability of Witnesses and Misconduct Database (Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590
Title
Criminal Procedure - Required Disclosures - Brady Material
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB0720)
Title
Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0902)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0049 Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0052 (SB0454) Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0268 Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0281 (SB0159) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0365 Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Prosecution of Police Officer Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0488 Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0536 (SB0416) Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0720 (SB0629) Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0816 Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0902 (SB0669) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB1049 Police Qualified Immunity and Accountability Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1070 Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1378 Forensic Analysis - Letter of Exception - Criminal Proceedings Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0159 (HB0281) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0416 (HB0536) Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0454 (HB0052) Real Property – Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 Law Enforcement Officers - Creditability of Witnesses and Misconduct Database (Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 Criminal Procedure - Required Disclosures - Brady Material Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 (HB0720) Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0669 (HB0902) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page