Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Trials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Registration of Affected Property
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0015)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0265)
Title
Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Maryland Parental Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 (SB0850)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Custodial Interrogation of Minors - Admissibility of Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408 (SB0758)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418
Title
Marriage – Confidential Communication – Criminal Charge
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 (HB0340)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0559)
Title
Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382
Title
Intercepted Communications - Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457
Title
Workgroup to Study Trial in Absence
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1408)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings (The Judicial Transparency Act 2.0)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0997)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0174 Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Registration of Affected Property Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 (SB0015) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
HB0559 (SB0265) Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until next session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0618 Maryland Parental Rights Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0997 (SB0850) Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Custodial Interrogation of Minors - Admissibility of Statements Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 (SB0758) Criminal Procedure – Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1418 Marriage – Confidential Communication – Criminal Charge Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 (HB0340) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0265 (HB0559) Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0382 Intercepted Communications - Admissibility of Evidence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 Workgroup to Study Trial in Absence Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0758 (HB1408) Criminal Procedure - Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings (The Judicial Transparency Act 2.0) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0850 (HB0997) Criminal Procedure - Restorative Justice Program Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/29/2022 9:24 AM
Click to return on the top page