Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Truancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0355
Title
Education - Truant Students
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657
Title
Truancy Education Program - Parents and Guardians of Students
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005
Title
Baltimore County - Commission to Study the Establishment of a Truancy Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0207 /CH0355 Education - Truant Students Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Ways and Means
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 Truancy Education Program - Parents and Guardians of Students Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1005 Baltimore County - Commission to Study the Establishment of a Truancy Reduction Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page