Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Tuition

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002 (SB0002/CH0072)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 (SB0155)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 (SB0554)
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Independence From University System of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Student Education Equity Grant Program - Established (Student Education Equity in Funding Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406
Title
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0059
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0077 (SB0014/CH0076)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Higher Education - Active Duty Law Enforcement Officers - Tuition Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Underrepresented Teachers
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056 (SB0827)
Title
Nonpublic Schools - Adequate Health Services - Eligibility for Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 (SB0538)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0941)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172
Title
Higher Education – Pay It Forward Program and Pay It Forward Fund – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 /CH0076 (HB0742/CH0077)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB0216)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB1067)
Title
Community Colleges and Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0246)
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB1056)
Title
Nonpublic Schools – Adequate Health Services – Eligibility for Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1170)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Virtual Schools – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 (SB0002/CH0072) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0216 (SB0155) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0246 (SB0554) Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0259 Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Independence From University System of Maryland Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0266 Student Education Equity Grant Program - Established (Student Education Equity in Funding Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0406 Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0670 /CH0059 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0742 /CH0077 (SB0014/CH0076) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0858 Higher Education - Active Duty Law Enforcement Officers - Tuition Exemption Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0918 Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Underrepresented Teachers Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1056 (SB0827) Nonpublic Schools - Adequate Health Services - Eligibility for Reimbursement Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1067 (SB0538) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1113 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1170 (SB0941) Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Schools - Alterations Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB1172 Higher Education – Pay It Forward Program and Pay It Forward Fund – Established Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
SB0014 /CH0076 (HB0742/CH0077) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0155 (HB0216) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0538 (HB1067) Community Colleges and Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0554 (HB0246) Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB1056) Nonpublic Schools – Adequate Health Services – Eligibility for Reimbursement Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0941 (HB1170) Primary and Secondary Education – Virtual Schools – Alterations Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/20/2021 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page