Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Vagrancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM
Click to return on the top page