Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Veterans Affairs, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 (SB0223)
Title
Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354
Title
Maryland Pathway to Nursing Pilot Program and Advisory Committee - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0012 (SB0411/CH0011)
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Renaming and Deputy Secretary of Military Family Policy and Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 /CH0792 (SB1009/CH0793)
Title
Task Force on Responsible Use of Natural Psychedelic Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0656
Title
Principal Departments - Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Access to Public Services
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB0255)
Title
Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 /CH0011 (HB0431/CH0012)
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Renaming and Deputy Secretary of Military Family Policy and Programs
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0434 (HB0133)
Title
Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 /CH0866
Title
Maryland Pathway to Nursing Pilot Program and Advisory Committee - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887
Title
Veterans Affairs - Responses to Arrested Veterans and Veterans in Crisis
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012
Title
Veterans Affairs – Disabled Veterans Guaranteed Basic Income
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 /CH0599 (HB1168/CH0600)
Title
Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 (SB0223) Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0354 Maryland Pathway to Nursing Pilot Program and Advisory Committee - Establishment Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0431 /CH0012 (SB0411/CH0011) Department of Veterans Affairs - Renaming and Deputy Secretary of Military Family Policy and Programs Delegate Pruski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0548 /CH0792 (SB1009/CH0793) Task Force on Responsible Use of Natural Psychedelic Substances Delegate Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 792
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0981 /CH0656 Principal Departments - Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Access to Public Services Delegate Martinez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 (HB0255) Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0411 /CH0011 (HB0431/CH0012) Department of Veterans Affairs - Renaming and Deputy Secretary of Military Family Policy and Programs Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0448 /CH0434 (HB0133) Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0718 /CH0866 Maryland Pathway to Nursing Pilot Program and Advisory Committee - Establishment Senator Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 866
Finance
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0887 Veterans Affairs - Responses to Arrested Veterans and Veterans in Crisis Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB1012 Veterans Affairs – Disabled Veterans Guaranteed Basic Income Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB1013 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1028 /CH0599 (HB1168/CH0600) Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page