Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 /CH0178 (SB0067/CH0179)
Title
Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0185
Title
Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0179 (HB0022/CH0178)
Title
Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 /CH0178 (SB0067/CH0179) Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0038 /CH0185 Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 /CH0179 (HB0022/CH0178) Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page