Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Veterinarians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 (SB0235)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Dispensers – Veterinarians
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0641)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Membership - Veterinary Pharmacist
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance – Pet Insurance – Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099
Title
Veterinary Practitioners and Veterinary Technicians - Compounding Prescription Drugs - Authorization and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388 (SB1182)
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses for Veterinary and Health Care Professionals and Study of the Health Care Market
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1398 (SB0900)
Title
Higher Education – Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0745)
Title
Virginia-Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Nawrocki
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157
Title
Domestic Animals - Penalties for Abandonment and Microchip Requirements for Dogs
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 (HB0057)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Dispensers - Veterinarians
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB0085)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB1494)
Title
Virginia-Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Testing Facilities That Use Animals - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB1398)
Title
Higher Education – Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1182 (HB1388)
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses - Veterinary and Health Care Professionals
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 (SB0235) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Dispensers – Veterinarians Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0085 (SB0641) Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0171 State Board of Pharmacy - Membership - Veterinary Pharmacist Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 Property and Casualty Insurance – Pet Insurance – Regulation Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 Veterinary Practitioners and Veterinary Technicians - Compounding Prescription Drugs - Authorization and Requirements Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1388 (SB1182) Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses for Veterinary and Health Care Professionals and Study of the Health Care Market Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1398 (SB0900) Higher Education – Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Eligibility Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB1494 (SB0745) Virginia-Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine - Funding Delegate Nawrocki 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0157 Domestic Animals - Penalties for Abandonment and Microchip Requirements for Dogs Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0235 (HB0057) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Dispensers - Veterinarians Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0641 (HB0085) Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/16/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0745 (HB1494) Virginia-Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine - Funding Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0761 Testing Facilities That Use Animals - Licensing and Regulation Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0872 Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB1398) Higher Education – Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Eligibility Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1182 (HB1388) Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses - Veterinary and Health Care Professionals Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page