Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Visitation Rights -see also- Chlid Custody

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB1004)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Addison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837
Title
Task Force to Study Forced Infant Separation From Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Visitation Reevaluations and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0548)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 (SB0539)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriptions for Children Subject to Shared Custody or Visitation Schedules
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505 (SB0521)
Title
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB1505)
Title
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB1493)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriptions for Children Subject to Shared Custody or Visitation Schedules
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB1191)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 (HB0721)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0721 (SB1004) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Addison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 Task Force to Study Forced Infant Separation From Incarcerated Individuals Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1165 Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Visitation Reevaluations and Remedies Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 (SB0548) Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1493 (SB0539) Health Occupations - Prescriptions for Children Subject to Shared Custody or Visitation Schedules Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB1505 (SB0521) Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0521 (HB1505) Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
SB0539 (HB1493) Health Occupations - Prescriptions for Children Subject to Shared Custody or Visitation Schedules Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0548 (HB1191) Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations Senator James 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
SB1004 (HB0721) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/2/2025 5:02 PM
Click to return on the top page