Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Vocational Rehabilitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0415 (SB0894)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0470
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB0349/CH0415)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0349 /CH0415 (SB0894) Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1172 /CH0470 Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0894 (HB0349/CH0415) Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page