Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vulnerable Adults -see also- Developmental Disabilities; Eld

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 (SB0559/CH0631)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0357/CH0190)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 /CH0698 (SB0531/CH0699)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0625)
Title
Transportation of Disabled Persons - Transportation Network Companies - Employee Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978
Title
Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160
Title
Mental Health Law - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Service
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347
Title
Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 /CH0190 (HB0589)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 /CH0699 (HB0636/CH0698)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 /CH0631 (HB0529)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 (SB0559/CH0631) Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0589 (SB0357/CH0190) Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0636 /CH0698 (SB0531/CH0699) Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study Delegate Belcastro 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0726 (SB0625) Transportation of Disabled Persons - Transportation Network Companies - Employee Requirements Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1160 Mental Health Law - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Service Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB1347 Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0357 /CH0190 (HB0589) Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 /CH0699 (HB0636/CH0698) Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0559 /CH0631 (HB0529) Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:22 PM
Click to return on the top page