Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Weapons -see also- Guns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 (SB0705)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338 (SB0817)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429
Title
Natural Resources - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1831
Title
Baltimore County Public Schools - Student Misconduct Offenses Relating to Weapons - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1832
Title
Education - Public Schools - Threat Assessment Report
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0012
Title
Presidential Authority Over the Use of Nuclear Weapons
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0920)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB1338)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0920 (SB0705) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1338 (SB0817) Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 Natural Resources - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1831 Baltimore County Public Schools - Student Misconduct Offenses Relating to Weapons - Report Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1832 Education - Public Schools - Threat Assessment Report Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0012 Presidential Authority Over the Use of Nuclear Weapons Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0920) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 (HB1338) Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:59 PM
Click to return on the top page