Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333 /CH0367
Title
Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834
Title
Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137 (SB0898)
Title
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB0332/CH0455)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0455 (HB1328)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884)
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1137)
Title
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Application Fees - Prospective Tenants Who Receive Housing Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0333 /CH0367 Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - Application Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0834 Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0884 (SB0686/CH0526) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 (SB0898) Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1328 (SB0332/CH0455) Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1333 Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0332 /CH0455 (HB1328) Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 /CH0526 (HB0884) Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1137) Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1059 Landlord and Tenant - Application Fees - Prospective Tenants Who Receive Housing Assistance Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page