Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 /CH0445 (SB0417)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0166)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889
Title
Public Assistance Programs - Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 /CH0199
Title
Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1041 (SB0829)
Title
Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043 (SB0828)
Title
Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Coercion (Coercive Abuse Against Mothers Prevention Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB0765)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0379/CH0445)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 /CH0360
Title
State Health Plan - Chesapeake Bay Commission - Retirees
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828 (HB1043)
Title
Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 (HB1041)
Title
Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0092 Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 /CH0445 (SB0417) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 (SB0166) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0889 Public Assistance Programs - Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2022) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 /CH0199 Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission - Membership Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1041 (SB0829) Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1043 (SB0828) Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1167 Public Health - Abortions - Coercion (Coercive Abuse Against Mothers Prevention Act) Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Delegate Attar 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1294 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB0765) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0236 Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day)) Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0417 (HB0379/CH0445) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2022 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0801 /CH0360 State Health Plan - Chesapeake Bay Commission - Retirees Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2022 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0828 (HB1043) Family Investment Program – Eligibility, Work Experience, Community Service, and Reports – Alterations Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0829 (HB1041) Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/24/2022 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page