Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Wholesale Distribution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0587 (SB0325/CH0588)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 (SB0193)
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 /CH0519
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 /CH1011 (SB0734/CH1012)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056 /CH0962 (SB0986)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340 /CH0964
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Monopoly of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341 /CH1039 (SB0941/CH1040)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers and Self-Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193 (HB0357)
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0588 (HB0001/CH0587)
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH1040 (HB1341/CH1039)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers and Self-Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1056/CH0962)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1041 /CH0918 (HB1217)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0587 (SB0325/CH0588) Maryland Paint Stewardship Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0357 (SB0193) Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
HB0512 /CH0519 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries - Reporting Requirements Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2024 - 12:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0635 /CH1011 (SB0734/CH1012) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1011
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1056 /CH0962 (SB0986) State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution Delegate Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 962
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1340 /CH0964 Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Monopoly of Liquor Control Board and Dispensary - Repeal Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 964
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1341 /CH1039 (SB0941/CH1040) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers and Self-Distribution Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1039
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0193 (HB0357) Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 /CH0588 (HB0001/CH0587) Maryland Paint Stewardship Senator Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0941 /CH1040 (HB1341/CH1039) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers and Self-Distribution Senator Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1040
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0986 (HB1056/CH0962) State Board of Pharmacy - Prohibition on Discrimination Against 340B Drug Distribution Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1041 /CH0918 (HB1217) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 918
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page