Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Wholesale Distribution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124 /CH0508 (SB0160/CH0509)
Title
Residential Property - Assignment of Contracts of Sale - Disclosure Requirements and Rescission
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 (SB0221)
Title
Cannabis - Wholesaler License - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 (SB0346)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 /CH0430 (SB0428)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Legacy Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834 (SB0806)
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 /CH0624 (SB0931/CH0623)
Title
Public Utilities - Generating Stations - Generation and Siting (Renewable Energy Certainty Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0909)
Title
Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 (SB0842/CH0305)
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Seizure and Wholesaler Record-Keeping Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1441 (SB0918)
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469
Title
Taxes - Sugary Beverage Distributor Tax (For Our Kids Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0509 (HB0124/CH0508)
Title
Residential Property - Assignment of Contracts of Sale - Disclosure Requirements and Rescission
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 (HB0204)
Title
Cannabis - Wholesaler License - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB0232)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB0506/CH0430)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Legacy Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806 (HB0834)
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 /CH0305 (HB1241)
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Seizure and Wholesaler Record-Keeping Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 (HB1037)
Title
Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB1441)
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 /CH0623 (HB1036/CH0624)
Title
Public Utilities - Generating Stations - Generation and Siting (Renewable Energy Certainty Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 /CH0625 (HB1035/CH0626)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act)
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0124 /CH0508 (SB0160/CH0509) Residential Property - Assignment of Contracts of Sale - Disclosure Requirements and Rescission Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0204 (SB0221) Cannabis - Wholesaler License - Establishment Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0232 (SB0346) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2025 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0506 /CH0430 (SB0428) Chesapeake Bay Legacy Act Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0834 (SB0806) Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 /CH0624 (SB0931/CH0623) Public Utilities - Generating Stations - Generation and Siting (Renewable Energy Certainty Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Economic Matters
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1037 (SB0909) Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act Delegate Crosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1241 (SB0842/CH0305) Electronic Smoking Devices - Seizure and Wholesaler Record-Keeping Requirements Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1441 (SB0918) Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1469 Taxes - Sugary Beverage Distributor Tax (For Our Kids Act) Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0160 /CH0509 (HB0124/CH0508) Residential Property - Assignment of Contracts of Sale - Disclosure Requirements and Rescission Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0221 (HB0204) Cannabis - Wholesaler License - Establishment Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 (HB0232) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB0506/CH0430) Chesapeake Bay Legacy Act President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0806 (HB0834) Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 /CH0305 (HB1241) Electronic Smoking Devices - Seizure and Wholesaler Record-Keeping Requirements Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Finance
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 (HB1037) Energy Resource Adequacy and Planning Act Senator Hester 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0918 (HB1441) Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 /CH0623 (HB1036/CH0624) Public Utilities - Generating Stations - Generation and Siting (Renewable Energy Certainty Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0937 /CH0625 (HB1035/CH0626) Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act) President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/28/2025 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page