Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0664)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 /CH0768 (SB0645)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0769 (SB0646/CH0770)
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B–BF (Banquet Facility) License
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1180/CH0768)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 /CH0770 (HB1181/CH0769)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-BF (Banquet Facility) License
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1144)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892
Title
Wicomico County Board of Education - Expenditure Report Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 /CH0385
Title
Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0664) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 /CH0768 (SB0645) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1181 /CH0769 (SB0646/CH0770) Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B–BF (Banquet Facility) License Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1436 Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB1180/CH0768) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0646 /CH0770 (HB1181/CH0769) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-BF (Banquet Facility) License Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0664 (HB1144) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 Wicomico County Board of Education - Expenditure Report Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0950 /CH0385 Wicomico County - Orphans' Court - Salary of Orphans' Court Judges Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page