Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 (SB0440)
Title
Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 (SB0629)
Title
Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Violent Crimes Special Prosecution Unit for Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440 (HB0489)
Title
Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB0720)
Title
Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0489 (SB0440) Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0720 (SB0629) Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1236 Office of the Attorney General - Violent Crimes Special Prosecution Unit for Baltimore City Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0440 (HB0489) Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0629 (HB0720) Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 10:45 AM
Click to return on the top page