Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Witnesses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 (SB0004)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128
Title
Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 (SB0177)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0182)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403 (SB0443)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Roberson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978
Title
Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB1037)
Title
Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Tomlinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0998)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 (HB0115)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 (HB0383)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB0302)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 (HB0338)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0403)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653 (HB1101)
Title
Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB1425)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1392)
Title
Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 (HB1093)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0087 Criminal Law - Death Penalty Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0115 (SB0004) Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act) Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0128 Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0273 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0302 (SB0177) Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry Delegate Embry 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 (SB0182) Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0403 (SB0443) End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
2/16/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Roberson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report Delegate Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB1037) Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence Delegate Tomlinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0998) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0004 (HB0115) Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0027 (HB0383) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0034 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 (HB0302) Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 (HB0338) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0403) End-of-Life Option Act (The Honorable Elijah E. Cummings and the Honorable Shane E. Pendergrass Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0653 (HB1101) Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0998 (HB1425) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1037 (HB1392) Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 (HB1093) Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 6:32 PM
Click to return on the top page