Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0452)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0633)
Title
Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 (HB0856)
Title
Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0532 (SB0452) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 (SB0633) Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0940 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 (HB0856) Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page