Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0096 (SB0032/CH0097)
Title
Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672
Title
Worcester County – Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 (SB0351)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 /CH0097 (HB0012/CH0096)
Title
Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 (HB1123)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0096 (SB0032/CH0097) Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 Worcester County – Turkey Hunting – Sundays Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 (SB0351) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Worcester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0032 /CH0097 (HB0012/CH0096) Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0351 (HB1123) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page