Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 (SB0060)
Title
Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0386)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0518
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Catching of Oysters or Clams - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 (HB0056)
Title
Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows – Out–of–State Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0456)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 (SB0060) Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0456 (SB0386) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0613 /CH0518 Natural Resources - Recreational Catching of Oysters or Clams - Requirements Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 (HB0056) Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows – Out–of–State Dealers Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0456) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2024 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page