Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Workers' Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0524)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0374)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – 9–1–1 Specialists
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0433)
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation Claims - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Medical Cannabis – Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Employment – Workers’ Compensation and Workplace Discrimination – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0671)
Title
Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105 (SB0633)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 (HB0439)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - 9-1-1 Specialists
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0433 (HB0501)
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation Claims - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0108)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0849)
Title
Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0524) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0439 (SB0374) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – 9–1–1 Specialists Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0501 (SB0433) Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation Claims - Fees for Legal Services Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0614 Workers’ Compensation – Medical Cannabis – Compensation and Benefits Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
HB0628 Employment – Workers’ Compensation and Workplace Discrimination – Use of Medical Cannabis Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB0650 Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0849 (SB0671) Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1105 (SB0633) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1164 Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 (HB0439) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - 9-1-1 Specialists Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0433 (HB0501) Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation Claims - Fees for Legal Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0108) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0605 Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0671 (HB0849) Economic Development - Eligibility for State Job Creation Incentives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 8:47 PM
Click to return on the top page