Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Workers' Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0144)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 (SB0406)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398
Title
Economic Development Tax Credit Programs - Qualified Position and Qualified Employee - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 (SB0377)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Offset and Hearing Loss
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0071)
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Hernia
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 (SB0538)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961
Title
State Department of Education - School Psychologist Recruitment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Business Regulation – Professional Power Washers – Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106
Title
Maryland College Investment Plan – Subtraction Modification Amounts and Eligibility and Establishment of Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 (HB0800)
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 (HB0169)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB0590)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Offset and Study
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406 (HB0335)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0919)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0902)
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Hernia
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 (SB0144) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
3/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0335 (SB0406) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0398 Economic Development Tax Credit Programs - Qualified Position and Qualified Employee - Definitions Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 (SB0377) Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Offset and Hearing Loss Delegate Pruski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0071) Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0902 (SB0839) Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Hernia Delegate Pruski 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0919 (SB0538) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 State Department of Education - School Psychologist Recruitment Program Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 Business Regulation – Professional Power Washers – Registration Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1012 Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1106 Maryland College Investment Plan – Subtraction Modification Amounts and Eligibility and Establishment of Accounts Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0071 (HB0800) Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation Senator Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 (HB0169) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/31/2023 - 3:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0377 (HB0590) Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Offset and Study Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0406 (HB0335) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0919) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0902) Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Hernia Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 7:53 PM
Click to return on the top page