Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Workplace Retaliation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0576)
Title
Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030 (SB0747)
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Deactivation of Operators - Policy and Appeal Procedure
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 (SB0938)
Title
Fraud Prevention and Worker Protections - Prohibitions, Penalties, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476
Title
Labor and Employment - Disclosure of Employee's Immigration Status - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Woorman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1548
Title
Employment - Harassment and Intimidation - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0233)
Title
Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB1030)
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Deactivation of Operators - Policy and Appeal Procedure
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938 (HB1096)
Title
Fraud Prevention and Worker Protections - Prohibitions, Penalties, and Enforcement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0233 (SB0576) Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act) Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1030 (SB0747) Transportation Network Companies - Deactivation of Operators - Policy and Appeal Procedure Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 (SB0938) Fraud Prevention and Worker Protections - Prohibitions, Penalties, and Enforcement Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 Labor and Employment - Disclosure of Employee's Immigration Status - Prohibition Delegate Woorman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1548 Employment - Harassment and Intimidation - Reporting Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0576 (HB0233) Labor and Employment - Mandatory Meetings on Religious or Political Matters - Employee Attendance and Participation (Maryland Worker Freedom Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Beidle)
Finance
SB0747 (HB1030) Transportation Network Companies - Deactivation of Operators - Policy and Appeal Procedure Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0938 (HB1096) Fraud Prevention and Worker Protections - Prohibitions, Penalties, and Enforcement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/10/2025 8:30 PM
Click to return on the top page