Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0137 - Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention

Judiciary 1/31/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/21/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/30/2024 9:08:10 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Grammer, Delegate Grammer FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Clark, Tiffany Office of the Attorney General FAV 2024-01-31 HB137 (Support).pdf JUD
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-01-31 HB137 Support.pdf JUD
Gobel, Christian Maryland State Education Association FAV 1.29.24 HB 137 Testimony_FAV.pdf JUD
O'Day, Garrett Maryland Catholic Conference FAV MD Catholic Conference_HB 137_FAV.pdf JUD
Egan, Nancy FAV HB 137 Educator Civil Immunity 013124 FAV HS JUD JUD
Goodwin, Keysha FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Wilson, Grace Anne Arundel County Public Schools FAV FINAL AACPS HB137 Civil Immunity Educator Interven JUD
Delegate Grammer, Delegate Grammer FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-21 HB137 (Support).pdf JPR
Rosa, Richard FAV No Testimony JPR
Egan, Nancy FAV HB 137 Educator Civil Immunity 03212024 Sen JPR F JPR
O'Day, Garrett Maryland Catholic Conference FAV MD Catholic Conference_HB 137_FAV SENATE CROSS.pdf JPR
Gobel, Christian Maryland State Education Association FAV 3.20.2024 MSEA Testimony XHB 137 Testimony_FAV.pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-21-2024 at 857 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page