Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
HB0302 - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Statement of Charges - Human Service Workers
Judiciary 2/4/2025 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/26/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/20/2025 5:02:52 PM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delegate Moon, Delegate Moon | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Government Affairs, Rachel Sledge | Department of Human Services | FAV | HB0302_FAV_DHS.pdf | JUD |
Schneider, Christian | Montgomery County Government | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Feinstein, Debbie | Montgomery County State's Attorney's Office | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Gilbert, Patrick | Maryland State's Attorneys' Association | FAV | HB 302 - MSAA Favorable.pdf | JUD |
Frey, Leslie | Montgomery County | FAV | HB302_Montgomery County CE_FAV 2025-02-04.pdf | JUD |
Khalfani, Natasha | Office of the Public Defender Maryland | UNF | 2025 4 2 HB 302 DHS Charges MOPD UNFAVORABLE.pdf | JUD |
Harris, Mrs. | INFO | No Testimony | JUD | |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-4-2025 at 823 AM | JUD | |
Delegate Moon, Delegate Moon | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Frey, Leslie | Montgomery County | FAV | HB302_Montgomery County CE_FAV 2025-03-26.pdf | JPR |
Schneider, Christian | Montgomery County Government | FAV | No Testimony | JPR |
Proctor, Karessa | NASW Maryland | FAV | NASW Maryland - 2025 HB 302 FAV - Statement of Cha | JPR |
Philip, Diana | Coalition to Protect Maryland's Children | FAV | HB0302 CPMC FAV JPR.pdf | JPR |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2025 at 1152 AM | JPR |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools