Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
HB0317 - Election Law - Curbside Voting - Pilot Program
Ways and Means 2/4/2025 1:00:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment 3/27/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/20/2025 7:28:00 PM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delegate Williams, Delegate Williams | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Rosa, Richard | UNF | No Testimony | W&M | |
Kelter, Chris | Maryland Centers for Independent Living | FAV | IL Legislative Network - HB317 - Favorable.pdf | W&M |
Plantz, Dorothy | FAV | Election Bill HBO317 House Ways and Means Testimo | W&M | |
Tibbals, Trudy | UNF | HB 317_ Election Law - Curbside Voting - Pilot Pr | W&M | |
Meyerovich, Mark | UNF | No Testimony | W&M | |
Williams, Nicole | Maryland General Assembly | FAV | HB 317 DNW Testimony.pdf | W&M |
London, Rachel | Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council | FAV | HB317.DDCouncil.Support.CurbsideVoting.pdf | W&M |
Gudger, John Michael | Maryland Association of Election Officials | INFO | Final - HB317 - 2025.docx.pdf | W&M |
Lang, Alan | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025 HB0317 Testimony Against 2025-02-04.pdf |
W&M | |
Othman, Ronza | National Federation of the Blind of Maryland | FWA | Favorable with Amendments HB 317 Curbside Voting.p | W&M |
Stinar, Braden | Disability Rights Maryland | FAV | DRM Written Testimony - Support - HB 317 Curbside | W&M |
Antoine, Joanne | Common Cause Maryland | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB 317 - Election Law - Curbside Voting - Pilot Pr |
W&M |
Griffin, Charlesetta | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB 317 Election Law Curbside Voting Pilot.FAV.AARP |
W&M | |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FAV | Testimony in support of HB0317 - Election Law - Cu | W&M |
Tyree, Nikki | LWVMD | INFO | HB317 Election Law - Curbside Voting - Pilot Progr | W&M |
Payne, LaRah | FAV | Testimony Final in Support of HB 317 by LDP.pdf | W&M | |
Harris, Mrs. | INFO | No Testimony | W&M | |
Wiley, Monica | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony Testimony HB 317 Curbside Voting Bill copy.pdf |
W&M | |
Delegate Williams, Delegate Williams | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Antoine, Joanne | Common Cause Maryland | FAV | JUD - HB 317 - Election Law - Curbside Voting - Pi | EEE |
Stinar, Braden | Disability Rights Maryland | FAV | DRM WrittenFAV HB 317 Curbside Voting In Senate EE | EEE |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FWA | HB0317 crossover FWA - Election Law - Curbside Vot | EEE |
Tibbals, Trudy | UNF |
HB 317_ Election Law - Curbside Voting - Pilot Pr
Written Testimony for HB 317_ Election Law - Curb |
EEE | |
Williams, Nicole | Maryland General Assembly | FAV | (SENATE) DNW HB 317 Testimony.pdf | EEE |
Wieland, Tom | Ritchie Pharmacy , Brooklyn Park, Md. | UNF | DO NOT SUPPORT OF BILL20250321_11240737.pdf | EEE |
Lang, Alan | UNF | 2025 HB0317 Election Curbside Voting 2025-03-27.pd | EEE | |
Benhoff, Jean | UNF | HB0317 Curbside Voting.pdf | EEE | |
Payne, LaRah | FAV | Testimony for Senate in Support of HB 317 by LDP f | EEE | |
McShane, Jolie | UNF | HB0317 Curbside Voting.pdf | EEE | |
Griffin, Charlesetta | FAV | HB 317 Election Law Curbside Voting Pilot.FAV.AARP | EEE | |
Nelson, Mary | UNF | HB317 Curbside Voting - Unfavorable.pdf | EEE | |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2025 at 921 AM | EEE |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools