Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
HB0785 - Common Ownership Communities and Zoning Authorities - Operation of Family Child Care Homes - Limitations
Environment and Transportation 2/18/2025 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/27/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/19/2025 8:42:24 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delegate Feldmark, Delegate Feldmark | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
ENT | |
DANIELS, RUBY | MSFCCA | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony Testimony- HB 785.pdf |
ENT |
Truitt, Brittany | Family Childcare Alliance and A Step Ahead Learning | FAV |
HB 785-Letter of Support-no amendments-Family Chil
HB 785-Letter of Support-no amendments-Family Chil WrittenStatementHB0875.pdf |
ENT |
Truitt, Brittany | Family Childcare Alliance and A Step Ahead Learning | FAV |
HB 785-Letter of Support-no amendments-Family Chil
HB 785-Letter of Support-no amendments-Family Chil WrittenStatementHB0875.pdf |
ENT |
Peusch, Christina | Maryland State Child Care Association | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony HB 785 final testimony Feb 18 2025 mga.pdf |
ENT |
Straughn, Karen | Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General | FAV | HB 785 Letter of Support.pdf | ENT |
Wiggins, Grason | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB 785_MDCC_Child Care Providers_Registration and |
ENT | |
Morrow, Beth | FAV | HB 785 _MFN_FAV_Morrow_Family Child Care.pdf | ENT | |
Butchko, Dominic | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FWA | HB0785-ET_MACo_SWA.pdf | ENT |
Munroe, Kecia | Women's Caucus | FAV | Letter_Support_HB785_Womens_Caucus.docx.pdf | ENT |
Jahromi, Laura | Children's Opportunity Alliance | FAV | COA_written testimony_HB785 Common Ownership Commu | ENT |
Hands, Zach | MD State Board of "Educcation | FAV | HB785_Hands_FAV | ENT |
Delegate Feldmark, Delegate Feldmark | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Houck, Madeline | Maryland State Department of Education | FAV | HB0785- State Board- Support- Crossover.pdf | JPR |
Morrow, Beth | FAV | HB 785 _MFN_FAV_Morrow_Family Child Care_X-OVER.pd | JPR | |
Kent, Cynthia | UNF | HB785.OppositionWrittenTestimony.pdf | JPR | |
Straughn, Karen | Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General | FAV | HB 785 Crossover Letter of Support.pdf | JPR |
Peusch, Christina | Maryland State Child Care Association | FAV | HB 785 final testimony march 27 2025 judiciary mga | JPR |
Allen, Hannah | Maryland Chamber of Commerce | FAV | HB 785_MDCC_Child Care Providers_Registration and | JPR |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 3-27-2025 at 223 PM | JPR |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools