Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB0990 - Environment - Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Manufacturers

Environment and Transportation 3/1/2024 1:00:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment 3/26/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 6/18/2024 10:05:56 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Stein, Delegate Stein FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ENT
Benhoff, Jean UNF No Testimony ENT
Arndt, Dave FAV No Testimony ENT
Elaine, Arndt SELF FAV No Testimony ENT
sirkel, jess UNF No Testimony ENT
McGilvray, Laurie Climate Justice Wing of the Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0990_Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Manuf ENT
Raine, James FAV No Testimony ENT
Love, William UNF No Testimony ENT
Coble, Kim Maryland League of Conservation Voters FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB990 - MDLCV SUPPORT_ - Environment-Greenhouse Ga
ENT
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0990_Greenhouse_Gas_Reductions_Manufacturers_MLC ENT
Favazza, John Manis Canning & Associates FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Holcim HB 990 FWA.pdf
ENT
Fahrig, Landon Maryland Energy Administration FAV HB0990 - FAV.pdf ENT
Stewart, Frances Elders Climate Action Maryland FAV No Testimony ENT
Mauer, William FAV No Testimony ENT
Karkhanis, Neal FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony HB 990 Heidelberg - 01 March 2024.pdf
ENT
Rogers, Paul Heidelberg Materials FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony HB 990 Heidelberg - 01 March 2024.pdf
ENT
DOrazio, Peter Year UNF No Testimony ENT
Katz, Janet UNF No Testimony ENT
Nicholas, Betsy Potomac Riverkeeper Network FAV No Testimony ENT
Atkins, Robert UNF No Testimony ENT
Cohn, Debbie FAV Testimony HB990 Manucturing and Cement.pdf ENT
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony ENT
Dietz, Michelle The Nature Conservancy FAV HB 990 Environment - Greenhouse Gas Emissions Redu ENT
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony ENT
McNair, Lee Unitarian Universalist Environmental Justice Ministry FAV No Testimony ENT
Hopkins, Barbara UNF No Testimony ENT
McDonough, Caitlin HJM FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
ENT
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony ENT
Harris, Mrs. FAV No Testimony ENT
Knapp, Les Maryland Department of the Environment FAV HB 990 MDE SUP.pdf ENT
Ditraglia, Frank UNF No Testimony ENT
Gallagher, George ICQ UNF No Testimony ENT
Stein, Dana FAV Stein Testimony HB 990.pdf ENT
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony ENT
Skvirsky, Valerie MRMCA FWA HB990_MRMCA_FWA ENT
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-4-2024 at 1108 AM ENT
Delegate Stein, Delegate Stein FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
Arndt, Dave FAV HB0990_Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Manuf EEE
Pedersen, Stacy UNF Vote NO on HB 990.pdf EEE
Cohn, Debbie FAV Testimony HB990 Manufacturing and Cement (Senate E EEE
McGilvray, Laurie Climate Justice Wing of the Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0990_Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Manuf EEE
Harbeson, Kristen Maryland League of Conservation Voters FAV CF HB990 - MDLCV SUPPORT_ - Environment-Greenhouse EEE
Karkhanis, Neal FAV Testimony 990 Heidelberg 25 March 2024.pdf EEE
Stein, Dana FAV Stein Testimony HB 990 - Senate.pdf EEE
Fahrig, Landon Maryland Energy Administration FAV HB0990 - FAV - Senate.pdf EEE
Thompson, Chuck UNF HB 990.pdf EEE
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV HB0990_Greenhouse_Gas_Reductions_Manufacturers_MLC EEE
Lang, Alan UNF 2024 HB0990 Testimony Against 2024-03-26.pdf EEE
Love, William UNF HB0990 Testimony.pdf EEE
Knapp, Les Maryland Department of the Environment FAV HB 990 MDE SUP.pdf EEE
Williams, Peggy UNF HB0990 Oppose.pdf EEE
Diefenbach, Linda UNF HB990—OPPOSE.pdf EEE
Rosales, Mariana The Nature Conservancy FAV HB 990 Environment - Greenhouse Gas Emissions Redu EEE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2024 at 926 AM EEE
Click to return on the top page