Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB1186 - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms - Study Extension

Judiciary 3/3/2021 1:30:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/31/2021 1:45:00 PM
As of: 5/12/2021 6:16:10 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Clippinger, Delegate Clippinger FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Josselyn, John 2A Maryland UNF Oral Testimony JUD
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-03-03 HB 1186 (Support).pdf JUD
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FAV HB1186_MNADV_FAV.pdf JUD
Delegate Clippinger, Delegate Clippinger FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FAV HB1186_JPR_MNADV_FAV.pdf JPR
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-03-31 (Crossover) HB 1186 (Support).pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-30-2021 at 943 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page