Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB1239 - Fair Housing and Housing Discrimination - Regulations, Intent, and Discriminatory Effect

Environment and Transportation 2/28/2025 1:00:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings 3/26/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/25/2025 8:10:04 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Taveras, Delegate Taveras FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ENT
Puentes, Erica Progressive Maryland FAV Progressive MD. HB1239. FAV. Fair Housing.pdf ENT
Taveras, Deni Maryland General Assembly FAV Deni's Testimony-4.pdf ENT
Lent, Michael FAV No Testimony ENT
Dove, Spencer Maryland Commission on Civil Rights FAV 2025-02-28-HB1239-Housing Disc-Intent (MCCR FAV).p ENT
Smith, Jonathan Attorney General of Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 1239 OAG testimony in support 2025 housing disp
ENT
London, Rachel Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council INFO HB1239.DDCouncil.LOI.pdf ENT
Latino Caucus, Maryland Legislative FAV HB1239 - Fair Housing and Housing Discrimination – ENT
May, Lisa Maryland REALTORS FAV HB 1239 - Fair Housing - FAV - REALTORS.pdf ENT
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV No Testimony ENT
Mauer, William FAV No Testimony ENT
Kelter, Chris Maryland Centers for Independent Living FAV No Testimony ENT
Graf, Lori Maryland Building Industry Association UNF MBIA Letter of Opposition HB 1239.pdf ENT
Browning, Jeremy Maryland Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs FAV HB1239 Fair Housing and Housing Discrimination - R ENT
Cook, Chuck Department of Housing and Community Development FAV HB1239_DHCD_SUPPORT.pdf ENT
Hoffman, Charlotte Trans Maryland FAV HB1239 - Fair Housing and Housing Discrimination - ENT
Fontaine, Diana Congressman Glenn Ivey FAV HB1239 Letter of Support - Congressman Glenn Ivey. ENT
Themelis, Nina Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV HB1239-ET-SUPP.pdf ENT
Hill, Matt FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 1239 PJC FAV.pdf
ENT
Wheaton, David NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ENT
Amador, Ninfa CASA FAV No Testimony ENT
Guzzone, J. Community Associations Institute UNF HB1239_CAI_UNF ENT
Delegate Taveras, Delegate Taveras FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
London, Rachel Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council INFO HB1239.DDCouncil.LOI.CF.pdf JPR
Taveras, Deni Maryland General Assembly FAV Deni's Testimony-4.pdf JPR
Dove, Spencer Maryland Commission on Civil Rights FAV 2025-03-26-HB1239-Housing Disc-Intent (MCCR FAV).p JPR
Ogletree-George, Rashida Maryland Office of the Attorney General, Civil Rights Division FAV HB 1239 OAG testimony in support 2025 housing disp JPR
Wambui, Maureen FAV Maureen Wambui Testimony in Support of HB1239 – Fa JPR
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV No Testimony JPR
Dixon, Monique Gibson-Banks Center for Race and the Law, University of Maryland Carey School of Law FAV Gibson Banks Center Testimony HB 1239 - Fair Housi JPR
Shah, Zafar Maryland Legal Aid FAV HB1239 - Senate JPR - Maryland Legal Aid - FAV.pdf JPR
Hill, Matt FAV HB 1239 PJC FAV in Senate.pdf JPR
Clark, Ashley Harris Jones & Malone, LLC FWA AOBA & MMHA HB1239 - FWA.pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2025 at 1156 AM JPR
Click to return on the top page