Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
HB1253 - Department of Social and Economic Mobility - Established
Appropriations 2/25/2025 1:00:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment 3/26/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/24/2025 3:24:51 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Speaker, Speaker | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
APP | |
Rosa, Richard | UNF | No Testimony | APP | |
Taylor, Ronnie | FreeState Justice | FAV | FreeState_Justice_HB1253_FAVORABLE.pdf | APP |
Gross, Kenneth | UNF | No Testimony | APP | |
Kelter, Chris | Maryland Centers for Independent Living | FAV | No Testimony | APP |
Meyerovich, Mark | UNF | No Testimony | APP | |
Clark, Tiffany | Office of the Attorney General | FAV | MD OAG_Written Testimony_HB 1253 .pdf | APP |
Lang, Alan | UNF | 2025 HB1253 Testimony Against 2025-02-25.pdf | APP | |
Baker, Jeremy | Office of the Governor | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
APP |
Speaker, Speaker | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Lang, Alan | UNF | 2025 HB1253 Testimony Against 2025-03-26.pdf | EEE | |
Bogdan, Henry | Maryland Nonprofits | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Clark, Tiffany | Office of the Attorney General | FWA | 2025_03_26 HB 1253 Support with Amendments.pdf | EEE |
Meyerovich, Mark | UNF | No Testimony | EEE | |
Themelis, Nina | Mayor's Office of Government Relations | FAV | HB1253-EEE-FAV.pdf | EEE |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 3-25-2025 at 941 AM | EEE |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools