Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0123 - Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence

Judicial Proceedings 2/1/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 3/28/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/20/2024 8:13:14 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Tsiongas, Magdalena FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
SB123MTsiongasTestimony.pdf
JPR
Robinson, Sierra FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Idrissa, Deborah Mother of lifer FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Miller, Linda Maryland Judiciary UNF sb123.pdf JPR
Lichtenberg, Judith Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV MAJR testimony supporting SB 123.pdf
MAJR testimony supporting SB 123.pdf
Ricardo Burks SB123 testimony.pdf
JPR
Sabin, Edward Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Support SB123.pdf
JPR
Clark, Tiffany Office of the Attorney General INFO 2024-02-01 SB0389 & SB0123 (Support in Concept).pd JPR
Forshee, Aimee FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Alston, Curtis F.R.E.S.H FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony for SB 123.pdf
JPR
Cichowski, Carol Montgomery County Women’s Democratic Club FAV WDC Testimony on SB123 (2024)_FINAL.pdf JPR
Carter, Jill FWA SB123 - Second Look Act (1) (002).pdf
SB123 - Second Look Act.pdf
JPR
trusty, celeste FAV FAMM SB 123 SUPPORT.pdf JPR
Amanuel, Yanet FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB123_FAV_Amanuel .pdf
JPR
Greene, Jami Jamesina Greene FAV Copy of SB 0123 SampleTestimony - 01.25.2024.pdf JPR
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0123_Petition_to_Reduce_Sentence_MLC_FAV.pdf JPR
Kroll, Steven Maryland State's Attorneys' Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Turner-Bey, Alonzo FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Hamilton, Katia My Mama's Vegan FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Bailey, Alexandra The Sentencing Project FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Shellenberger, Scott Baltimore County State's Attorney's Office UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 123 Criminal Procedure-Postconviction Review-Mo
JPR
Dartigue, Natasha MARYLAND OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Mitchell, William MD Second Look Coalition FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
William Mitchell Testimony.pdf
JPR
Spaccasi, Olivia ACLU-MD FWA James Watkins Testimony.pdf JPR
HAZELTON, MARTINA FAMILY SUPPORT NETWORK FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Craig Muhammad 01.29.2024.pdf
NBCI - 01.31.2024.pdf
NBCI - 01.31.2024v1.pdf
NBCI - 01.31.2024v2.pdf
SB 0123 - SECOND LOOK ACT - FSN - MARTINA HAZELTON
JPR
Shannon, Prechelle FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0123- Live Testimony- Prechelle Shannon. .pdf
JPR
Caroom, Philip Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV Support SB 123- Second Look Act (1).pdf JPR
Cantora , Andrea University of Baltimore FAV SB123 Feb2024.pdf JPR
Pack, Jr., Gordon FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
Gordon Pack's SB 0123 Testimony 2024.docx.pdf
JPR
Wallington, Keith Justice Policy Institute FAV SB123__support_JPI_1_31_24.pdf JPR
Mitchell, Karen Maryland State's Attorney Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Martz, Michelle Maryland Criminal Defense Attorneys’ Association (MCDAA) FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony JPR
Lawson, Jonee FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Simms, Stuart Retired FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB123Testimony.pdf
JPR
Muhammad, Anthony FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Written Testimony.pdf
JPR
Kouadio, Michele Maryland Alliance for Criminal Justice Reform FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
McNeill, Calvin FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony JPR
Carpenter, Crystal CFSY FAV No Testimony JPR
Bridges, Kam Job Opportunities Task Force FAV No Testimony JPR
Allen, Shawanda FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Ebb, Alice FAV SB123AEbbTestimony (1).pdf JPR
Childs, Carlos MD Lifers Coalition FAV Second Look testimony - Lifers.docx.pdf JPR
Dixon, Tiffany FAV No Testimony JPR
Phoenix, Dondre Maryland Second Look Coalition FAV TESTIMONY ON SB123.pdf JPR
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) INFO Sentence reduction - senate testimony - 2024 - SB JPR
Bradford, Davida FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
DORSEY, JOAN Second Look Coalition FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB123JDorseyTestimony.pdf
JPR
Hilliard, Elizabeth Maryland Office of the Public Defender FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Green, Linda Life After Release FAV Petition to reduce sentence.pdf JPR
Mitchell, Charna FAV No Testimony JPR
Lawson, Victoria FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Lodge, Jobrea FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Moyd, Esquire, Olinda Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV SB 0123 - Written Testimony by O. Moyd.pdf JPR
Lao, Serena FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB123 Support Testimony SLao.pdf
JPR
Smith, Theresa Family support network FAV Testimony .pdf JPR
Fletcher, Atoya FAV SB123.pdf JPR
Emerson, Jessica The Human Trafficking Prevention Project FAV No Testimony JPR
Gallagher, E. Flannery University of Baltimore Law School, Center for Criminal Justice Reform FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024.01.31 CCJR SB 123 FAV.pdf
JPR
Suter, Erica Maryland Office of the Public Defender FAV 2024 SB0123 Testimony Suter, Erica.pdf JPR
Perry, Desmond RECTIFY FAV Testimony SB 123.pdf JPR
Walker-Keegan, Rebecca U MD Youth, Education, and Justice Clinic FAV SB 123 Support Criminal Procedure - Reduce Sentenc JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-1-2024 at 958 AM JPR
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Walker-Keegan, Rebecca University of Maryland Francis King Carey School of Law FWA YEJ Clinic - Written Testimony in Support of SB 12 JUD
Shellenberger, Scott Baltimore County State's Attorney's Office UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 123 Criminal Procedure-Postconviction Review-Mo
JUD
Emerson, Jessica The Human Trafficking Prevention Project FAV No Testimony JUD
Lichtenberg, Judith Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FWA second look testimony house judic MAJR 2024.pdf JUD
Miller, Linda Maryland Judiciary UNF sb123amend (3).pdf JUD
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) INFO Sentence reduction - senate in house testimony - JUD
HAZELTON, MARTINA FAMILY SUPPORT NETWORK FWA SB 0123 - SECOND LOOK ACT - FSN - MARTINA HAZELTON JUD
Sabin, Edward Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FWA Support SB123.pdf JUD
Fenwick, Towanda Family Support Network FAV TESTIMONY ON SB123.pdf JUD
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General INFO 2024-03-28 SB123.pdf JUD
Meadows, Lila FAV SB123 Judiciary Testimony 03262024 - final.pdf JUD
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0123_Petition_to_Reduce_Sentence_MLC_FAV.pdf JUD
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony JUD
Childs, Carlos FWA Second Look bill in the House [SB 123].pdf JUD
Giordano, Hassan State's Attorney for Baltimore City FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Cichowski, Carol Montgomery County Women’s Democratic Club FWA WDC Testimony on SB 123, as amended (2024).pdf JUD
trusty, celeste FAV FAMM MD SB 123 Support House Judiciary Committee . JUD
Johnson, Dr. Carmen Helping Ourselves to Transform FAV SB 0123 Michele Kouadio - Reduce Sentence.pdf
Untitled document (2).pdf
JUD
Coleman, Megan MarcusBonsib, LLC FAV email testimony JUD
Sansone, Lisa Law Office of Lisa J Sansone FAV email testimony JUD
Tsiongas, Magdalena FWA SB123HouseHearingMTsiongasTestimony.pdf JUD
Ebb, Alice FWA SB123AEbbTestimony3.28.24.pdf JUD
Ingram, Resha FAV RESHA TESTIMONY ON HB 724.pdf JUD
Ristick, John FWA 2024March SB123 JRistickTestimony.pdf JUD
DORSEY, JOAN Second Look Coalition FWA 3.28SB123JDorseyTestimony.pdf JUD
Sealover, Barbara FWA March28SB123BSealoverTestimony.pdf JUD
Mupanduki, Joanna Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc. UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 123 Unfavorable by Joanna Mupanaduki MCVRC.pdf
JUD
Childs, Carlos FWA SB 123 Testimony [House].pdf JUD
Amanuel, Yanet FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
SB123_FWA_Amanuel .pdf
JUD
Lao, Serena FAV SB123 Testimony FAV JSexton.pdf
SB123 Testimony FWA SLao.pdf
JUD
Perry, Desmond MAJR / RECTIFY Inc. FAV Written Testimony For SB0123_HB0724.pdf JUD
Hilliard, Elizabeth Maryland Office of the Public Defender FAV MOPD Position on SB 0123.pdf JUD
Warnken, Heather University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
UBalt CCJR Law Clinic SB 123 FWA.pdf
JUD
Braveheart, T. Shekhinah Justice PoIicy Institute FAV SB 123-MD Second Look Act.Testimony.tsb.rk.pdf JUD
Lawal, Ngozi FWA 3-26-24 Ngozi Lawal Testimony on SB 123 to House.p JUD
TSHIWALA, BENOIT Office of the Public Defender FAV MOPD Position on SB 0123.pdf JUD
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-28-2024 at 1030 AM JUD
Click to return on the top page