Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0182 - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Eligibility - Family Members of Veterans
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/6/2025 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/18/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/9/2025 7:34:18 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Simonaire, Senator Simonaire | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Brooks, Benjamin | FAV | VeteransCaucusLegislationSupportLetter_SB182.pdf | EEE | |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0182 Testimony For 2025-02-06.pdf | EEE | |
Contino, Kara | Office of Senator Simonaire | FAV | SB 182 Senator Simonaire_FAV.pdf | EEE |
Dragics, DAVID | Maryland Military Coalition & Ft. George G. Meade Chapter of the Military Officers Association of America (MOAA) | FAV | Maryland Military Coalition SB0182 Written Testimo | EEE |
Murphy, Morgan | MD Dept of Veterans Affairs | FAV | DVMF SB182 Support.pdf | EEE |
Arias, Diane | Maryland Catholic Conference | FAV | Maryland Catholic Conference_FAV_SB182.pdf | EEE |
Rodgers, Kelly | Maryland Therapeutic Riding | FAV | SB 182 | EEE |
Harris, Mrs. | FAV | No Testimony | EEE | |
Mauer, William | FAV | No Testimony | EEE | |
Yount, Rick | Warrior Canine Connection | FAV | SB 182 | EEE |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-5-2025 at 1015 AM | EEE | |
Senator Simonaire, Senator Simonaire | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
HGO | |
Murphy, Morgan | MD Dept of Veterans Affairs | FAV | DVMF SB182 HGO LOS.pdf | HGO |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0182 Testimony For 2025-03-18.pdf | HGO | |
Arias, Diane | Maryland Catholic Conference | FAV | Maryland Catholic Conference_FAV_SB182_HouseCross. | HGO |
Leber, Verna | Senator Simonaire's Office | FAV |
Maryland Therapeutic Riding FAV
SB 182 Senator Simonaire_FAV_HGO.pdf |
HGO |
Brooks, Benjamin | FAV | VeteransCaucusLegislationSupportLetter_SB182.pdf | HGO | |
Dragics, DAVID | Maryland Military Coalition & Ft. George G. Meade Chapter of the Military Officers Association of America (MOAA) | FAV | Maryland Military Coalition SB0182 H&GO Written Te | HGO |
Yount, Rick | Warrior Canine Connection, Inc. | FAV | WCC support for SB 182.pdf | HGO |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools