Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0262 - Election Law - Special Elections
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/5/2025 2:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/18/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/9/2025 12:10:29 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm, Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Lang, Alan | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025 SB0262 Testimony Against 2025-02-05.pdf |
EEE | |
Benenati, Philip | Maryland Forward Party | FAV | SB 0262 - Maryland Forward Party.pdf | EEE |
Tibbals, Trudy | UNF | No Testimony | EEE | |
Gudger, John Michael | Maryland Association of Election Officials | FAV | Final - SB262 - 2025.pdf | EEE |
Kinnally, Kevin | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB0262-EEE_MACo_SUP.pdf |
EEE |
DeMarinis, Jared | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SBE Testimony SB262:HB75.pdf |
EEE | |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-4-2025 at 1004 AM | EEE | |
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm, Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Kinnally, Kevin | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FAV | SB0262-WM_MACo_SUP.pdf | W&M |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0262 Testimony For 2025-03-18.pdf | W&M |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools