Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0282 - Recreational Equality for Service Members Act
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/4/2025 1:00:00 PM
Environment and Transportation 3/26/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/9/2025 5:00:10 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Simonaire, Senator Simonaire | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Hunter, Joan | USPHS Service | FAV | Simonaire1.pdf | EEE |
Contino, Kara | Office of Senator Simonaire | FAV |
SB 282 Hugh McClean_UMB School of Law.pdf
SB 282 Senator Simonaire_FAV.pdf |
EEE |
Harris, Mrs. | UNF | No Testimony | EEE | |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0282 Testimony For 2025-02-04.pdf | EEE | |
Dragics, DAVID | Maryland Military Coalition & Ft. George G. Meade Chapter of the Military Officers Association of America (MOAA) | FWA | Maryland Military Coalition SB0282 Written Testimo | EEE |
Rey, Deborah | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025 HB494 SB282 Recreational Equality.pdf |
EEE | |
Nash, Lynn | Maryland Military Coalition / Commissioned Officers Association of the U.S. Public Health Services | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony Nash_oral_ Commissioned Officers Association_SB 28 Nash_written_Commissioned Officers Association_SB |
EEE |
Heredia, David | The American Legion | FAV | Support for Maryland SB 282 - 31 Jan 2025.pdf | EEE |
Davis, Jana | Chesapeake Bay Trust | FAV | SB 282 | EEE |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-4-2025 at 1251 PM | EEE | |
Senator Simonaire, Senator Simonaire | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
ENT | |
Hunter, Joan | USPHS Service | FAV | SB0282 Simonaire- House 03202025.pdf | ENT |
Davis, Jana | INFO | Ches Bay Trust Testimony - SB282-HouseENT.pdf | ENT | |
Contino, Kara | Office of Senator Simonaire | FAV | SB 282 Senator Simonaire_FAV_ENT.pdf | ENT |
Dragics, DAVID | Maryland Military Coalition & Ft. George G. Meade Chapter of the Military Officers Association of America (MOAA) | FAV | Maryland Military Coalition SB0282 Environment & T | ENT |
Brooks, Benjamin | FAV | VeteransCaucusLegislationSupportLetter_SB282.pdf | ENT | |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0282 Testimony For 2025-03-26.pdf | ENT | |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 3-27-2025 at 333 PM | ENT |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools