Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0290 - Office of the Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division - Authority to Prosecute

Judicial Proceedings 2/14/2023 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 4/4/2023 1:00:00 PM
As of: 6/14/2024 10:12:07 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Smith, Senator Smith FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Lambert, Melissa Harford County Sheriff's Office UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 290 Attorney General IID FINAL.pdf
JPR
Davey, Michael State Fraternal Order of Police UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Caroom, Philip Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV SUPPORT SB290.docx.pdf JPR
Draughon, Dwight FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Shoemaker, Haven Carroll County State's Attorney's Office UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB290_OppositionTestimony.pdf
JPR
Flowers , Willie NAACP - Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB290_NAACP.docx.pdf
JPR
Hellerbach, Hilary FAV SB%200290.pdf.pdf JPR
Hogan, Gerard None FAV Statement in support of Senate Bill 0290.pdf JPR
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony JPR
Soreng, Nancy FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 290 Office of the Attorney General - Independen
JPR
Mulhauser, Dana Office of Attorney General FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Boatwright, Clyde Maryland Fraternal Order of Police UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Hatch, Joshua Freedom Fighters, LLC FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Healey, Alison Maryland State's Attorney's Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SENATE BILL 290 IID - Unfavorable.pdf
JPR
Veiga, Robert FWA Virtual - Oral Testimony
Robert Veiga-SSJC Testimony SB 290 Favorable With
JPR
Plaut, Ari Boston Plaut Attorneys at Law UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Dartigue, Natasha MARYLAND OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
miller, david Uncut media llc FAV No Testimony JPR
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0290 Attorney General's Office -Authority to Pro JPR
Gibson, Rich Howard County State's Attorney's Office UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 0290_HoCoState'sAttorney_Unfav_OAG_IID_Authorit
JPR
Kroll, Steven Maryland State's Attorneys' Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
HEARD, WANDA UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony of WKH on 290.pdf
JPR
Mansfield, Andrea MD Chiefs and Sheriffs Association UNF MCPA-MSA-SB 290-AG Investigation _Authority to Pro JPR
Rhudy, Robert Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Rosenthal, Josh Public Rights Project FAV SB290_PRP_Rosenthal_FAV.pdf JPR
Mckesson, DeRay FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Shellenberger, Scott Baltimore County State's Attorney's Office UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 290 Office of Attorney General - Independent In
JPR
Parker, Josh Policing Project at NYU School of Law FAV Policing Project Testimony on SB0290 2-13-23.pdf JPR
Parker, Kristy FAV SB290_Parker_FAV.pdf JPR
Dellmyer, James Office of the State's Attorney for Cecil County UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV SB0290-Ofc AG IID-Authority to Prosecute.pdf JPR
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2023-02-14 Senate Bill 290 OAG (Support).pdf
JPR
Lewis, Mike Maryland Chiefs & Sheriffs Associations UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Leitess, Anne Colt Anne Arundel State's Attorney UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
Senate Bill 290 - acl.pdf
JPR
Warnken, Heather University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
In Suppport of SB 290 CCJR.pdf
JPR
Ramirez, Jared FAV No Testimony JPR
Beverley, Cassandra FAV SB290 testimony.pdf JPR
Bates, Ivan State's Attorney for Baltimore City UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Hanson- Mundell, Nicole FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Phelps, Jr., Kenneth Maryland Episcopal Public Policy Network FAV SB 290 expansion of auth of ag.pdf JPR
DeVaughn- Johnson, Ashley FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
JPR
Dykes, Jamie Wicomico County UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-13-2023 at 345 PM JPR
Brown, Anthony OAG FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Moore, Kelly FAV The Policing Project JPR
Senator Smith, Senator Smith FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Smith, Rebecca Maryland Troopers Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Massoni, Jenna UNF MTA Unfavorable SB 290 4-4-23.pdf JUD
Kroll, Steven Maryland State's Attorneys' Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Gill, Brian State Law Enforcement Officers Labor Alliance UNF SB 290 - SLEOLA - UNF - JUD 04-04-2023.pdf JUD
Brown, Anthony Office of the Attorney General FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2023-04-04 SB 290 Attorney General Brown (Support)
JUD
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0290 Attorney General's Office -Authority to Pro JUD
Phelps, Jr., Kenneth Maryland Episcopal Public Policy Network FAV No Testimony JUD
Click to return on the top page