Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0309 - Handgun Permit – Preliminary Approval

Judicial Proceedings 1/19/2021 11:00:00 AM
Judiciary 3/31/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 1/28/2023 9:21:04 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Hough, Senator Hough FAV No Testimony JPR
Pennak, Mark Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MSI Testimony on SB 309 favorable Preliminary appr
JPR
Novotny, Katie FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Katie_Novotny_FAV_S309.pdf
JPR
Carlin-Weber, Daniel FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
DC-W_SB309_Fav.pdf
JPR
Conwell, Joseph FAV No Testimony JPR
Spiker, D.J. National Rifle Association FAV SB309 - Support Letter.pdf JPR
Bartlett, Olivia DoTheMostGood UNF HB0309-UNFAV-DTMG-1-19-21.pdf JPR
Reynolds, Shaun Shaun Reynolds FAV No Testimony JPR
Burke, Michael Associated Gun Clubs Inc. FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 309 Handgun Permit.pdf
JPR
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit UNF 2021-01-19 SB 309 (Oppose).pdf JPR
Sakamoto-Wengel, Steven UNF 2021-01-19 SB 309 (Oppose).pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 1-17-2021 at 839 AM JPR
Senator Hough, Senator Hough FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Cheakalos, Paul FAV No Testimony JUD
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition UNF No Testimony JUD
Bartlett, Olivia DoTheMostGood UNF SB0309-UNFAV-Judiciary-DTMG-3-31-21.pdf JUD
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General UNF 2021-03-31 (Crossover) SB 309 (Oppose) - Copy.pdf JUD
Boston, Frank FOP FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Boston, Frank FOP FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB309 - Support Letter - House
JUD
Click to return on the top page