Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0313 - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/26/2025 1:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/26/2025 2:15:00 PM
As of: 5/9/2025 12:16:11 PM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Washington, M., Senator Washington, M. | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Plante, Cecilia | Maryland Legislative Coalition | FAV | SB0313_Election_Law_Risk_Limiting_Audits_MLC_FAV.p | EEE |
Brown-Krausz, Marna | Indivisible HOCOMD | FAV | Indivisible position on S313.pdf | EEE |
Goldstein, Mathew | Secular Maryland | FAV | SB0313_FAV_mgoldstein 2025.pdf | EEE |
Soreng, Nancy | FAV | 2-26-25 SB 313 - Election Law - Post Election Tabu | EEE | |
Park, Jiyoon | Brennan Center for Justice | FAV | BCJ Written Testimony - MD SB 313.pdf | EEE |
Fletcher, Michael | None | FWA | Comments on SB0313.pdf | EEE |
Mauer, William | UNF | No Testimony | EEE | |
Gallagher, George | Individual | UNF | No Testimony | EEE |
Lang, Alan | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025 SB0313 Testimony Against 2025-02-26.pdf |
EEE | |
Feryus, Stephen | Maryland Association of Election Officials (MAEO) | INFO | SB313 - 2025.pdf | EEE |
Iacobucci, Liz | Common Cause | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony Common Cause MD SB 313 RLA testimony.pdf |
EEE |
Lindeman, Mark | Verified Voting | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony Verified Voting Favorable SB 313.pdf |
EEE |
McNair, Lee | Unitarian Universalist Environmental Justice Ministry | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Justice, Gillian | Disability Rights Maryland | FAV | DRM Testimony - Favorable - SB 313 Post Election R | EEE |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-25-2025 at 928 AM | EEE | |
Senator Washington, M., Senator Washington, M. | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
CARRICK, SHARON | UNF | SB 313 Risk Limiting Audits.pdf | W&M | |
Plante, Cecilia | Maryland Legislative Coalition | FAV | SB0313_Election_Law_Risk_Limiting_Audits_MLC_FAV.p | W&M |
Wieland, Tom | Ritchie Pharmacy , Brooklyn Park, Md. | UNF | DO NOT SUPPORT OF BILL20250321_11240737.pdf | W&M |
LaPorte, Chrissa | Verified Voting | FAV | 20250321 - Verified Voting Favorable SB 313.pdf | W&M |
Iacobucci, Liz | Common Cause | FAV | 2025-03-21 Common Cause SB 313 testimony.pdf | W&M |
Goldstein, Mathew | Secular Maryland | FAV | SB0313_FAV_mgoldstein 2025.pdf | W&M |
Lang, Alan | UNF | 2025 SB0313 Testimony Against 2025-03-25.pdf | W&M |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools