Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0342 - Voting Rights Act of 2025 - Counties and Municipal Corporations
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/26/2025 1:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/26/2025 2:15:00 PM
As of: 5/21/2025 2:58:54 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Sydnor, Senator Sydnor | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Phelps Jr, Ken | The Episcopal Diocese of Maryland | FAV | sb 342 Voting Rights Act of 2025 - Counties and Mu | EEE |
Plante, Cecilia | Maryland Legislative Coalition | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Norling, Richard | MD Sierra Club | FAV | SB342_MDSierraClub_fav 26Feb2025.pdf | EEE |
Shelley, Dana Vickers | American Civil Liberties Union (ACLU) of Maryland | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE |
Mortoro, Lynn | FAV | SB0342 2:26:2025 Written Testimony.pdf | EEE | |
Bailey Thupari, Angelica | Maryland Municipal League | UNF | SB 342 - MML - OPP.pdf | EEE |
Lewis, Roderick | Mr. | FAV | St. Mary's NAACP Testimony SB0342 .pdf | EEE |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FAV | Testimony in support of SB0342 - Voting Rights Act | EEE |
Hudson, Lee | Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Williams, Lailah | Black Girls Vote | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony SB342.pdf |
EEE |
Taylor, Nina | The Center for Election Science | FAV |
America (Mis)Represented- 2022 Primaries Report (J
SB 342 - Voting Rights Act - CES.pdf |
EEE |
Mauer, William | UNF | No Testimony | EEE | |
Drayton, Morgan | Common Cause MD | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 342 - Voting Rights Act of 2025 – Counties and |
EEE |
Lioz, Adam | NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony LDF MDVRA Senate Vote Dilution Testimony 2 24 25.p |
EEE |
Coleman, Ryan | President, Randallstown NAACP | FAV | Support SB 0342.pdf | EEE |
Sydnor III, Charles E. | Senator Charles E. Sydnor III | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony Sen Sydnor_testimony SB342 Fav EEE v4.pdf |
EEE |
Lang, Alan | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025 SB0342 Testimony Against 2025-02-26.pdf |
EEE | |
Themelis, Nina | Mayor's Office of Government Relations | FAV | SB0342-EEE-SUPP.pdf | EEE |
Mulji, Aseem | Campaign Legal Center | FWA | 2.24 Sign On Letter.pdf | EEE |
Davis, Emily | Fair Elections Center | FWA | Fair Elections Ctr Testimony FAV with amendments S | EEE |
Tyree, Nikki | LWVMD | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 342 Voting Rights Act of 2025.pdf |
EEE |
Venkatraman, Nithin | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB342_Venkatraman_Williamson_FWA.pdf |
EEE | |
McNair, Lee | Unitarian Universalist Environmental Justice Ministry | FAV | No Testimony | EEE |
Ginsberg, Zoe | American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland | FWA | SB 342_FAV w AMEND_ACLU-MD.pdf | EEE |
Nott, Lata | Campaign Legal Center | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025.02.26 - MDVRA Senate Vote Dilution Written Te |
EEE |
Brooks, Monica | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Jones, Ricarra | NAACP | FWA | SB 342 NAACP (002).pdf | EEE |
Smith, Jonathan | Maryland Office of the Attorney General | FAV | Voting Rights Act | EEE |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-26-2025 at 446 PM | EEE | |
Senator Sydnor, Senator Sydnor | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Mnck, Marijane | Indivisible Howard County | FAV | SB342 to House Ways and Means.pdf | W&M |
Antoine, Joanne | Common Cause Maryland | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M |
Pernick, Michael | Legal Defense Fund | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025.03.21 - LDF Testimony in Support of SB 342.pd |
W&M |
Cavanagh, Terrence | SEIU Local 500 | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SEIU Local 500 Testimony on SB 342 - 2025.pdf |
W&M |
Nguyen, Phi | Demos | FAV | 2025_02_13 MD SB 342 Testimony.pdf | W&M |
Plante, Cecilia | Maryland Legislative Coalition | FAV | No Testimony | W&M |
Harbeson, Kristen | Maryland League of Conservation Voters | FAV | SB 342 - Maryland LCV Support - Voting Rights Act. | W&M |
Ginsberg, Zoe | American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland | FAV | SB 342_FAV_ACLU-MD_W+M.pdf | W&M |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FWA | SB0342 crossfile FWA - Voting Rights Act of 2025 - | W&M |
Shelley, Dana Vickers | American Civil Liberties Union (ACLU) of Maryland | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M |
Mulji, Aseem | Campaign Legal Center | FAV | 2025.03.21 - SB 342 House Written Testimony .pdf | W&M |
Sharp, Birgit | CANDLE | FAV | SB342 MDVRA of 2025 Candle Testimony.pdf | W&M |
Anderson, Owen | Ranked Choice Voting Maryland | FAV | SB342 Testimony in Support of Voting Rights Act of | W&M |
Nott, Lata | Campaign Legal Center | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M |
Stewart, Celina | LWVUS | FAV | Celina SB 342 Testimony.pdf | W&M |
Hudson, Lee | Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA | FAV | No Testimony | W&M |
Smith, Jonathan | Attorney General of Maryland | FWA | SB 342 House.pdf | W&M |
Drayton, Morgan | Common Cause MD | FAV | SB 342 - Voting Rights Act of 2025 – Counties and | W&M |
Voting Rights Act, Maryland | MD Voting Rights Act table | FAV | 3.21.25 SB 342 W&M Sign On Letter.docx.pdf | W&M |
Leiblum, Marisha | UNITE HERE Local 7 | FAV | UNITE HERE Local 7 Access Testimony HB 983.pdf | W&M |
Tyree, Nikki | LWVMD | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony 3-25 SB 342 Voting Rights Act of 2025.pdf |
W&M |
Lang, Alan | UNF | 2025 SB0342 Testimony Against 2025-03-25.pdf | W&M | |
Bailey Thupari, Angelica | Maryland Municipal League | UNF | SB 342 - CF - VRA 2025.pdf | W&M |
Sydnor III, Charles E. | Senator Charles E. Sydnor III | FAV | Sen Sydnor_testimony SB342 Fav Ways and Means.pdf | W&M |
Davis, Emily | Fair Elections Center | FAV | Fair Elections Ctr Testimony FAV re SB342 2025-03- | W&M |
DeVaughn, Ashley | Out for Justice | FAV | SB432.docx.pdf | W&M |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools