Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0343 - State's Attorneys - Reconstitution of Task Force to Study Transparency Standards for State's Attorneys
Judicial Proceedings 1/30/2025 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 3/25/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 4/26/2025 1:47:11 PM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Sydnor, Senator Sydnor | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR | |
Pearson, Melba | Prosecutorial Performance Indicators Project at Florida International University | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony |
JPR |
Kroll, Steven | Maryland State's Attorneys' Association | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JPR |
Sydnor III, Charles E. | Senator Charles E. Sydnor III | FAV | Sen Sydnor_testimony SB343 Fav.pdf | JPR |
Kemerer, Hannibal | Maryland Office of the Public Defender | FAV | 2025-01-30 SB 343 OPD on State's Attorney's Task F | JPR |
Warnken, Heather | University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 343 SAO Task Force CCJR FAV.pdf |
JPR |
Maryland Equitable Justice Collaborative, MECJ | Maryland Equitable Justice Collaborative | INFO | MEJC Written Testimony Informational SB 343 1-30.p | JPR |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 1-29-2025 at 902 AM | JPR | |
Senator Sydnor, Senator Sydnor | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD | |
Watkins, Caron | Harris Jones & Malone | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Mitchell, Karen | Maryland State's Attorney Association | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
JUD |
Kemerer, Hannibal | Maryland Office of the Public Defender | FAV | 2025-03-25 SB 343 Office of Public Defender (FAV C | JUD |
Meyerovich, Mark | FAV | No Testimony | JUD | |
Warnken, Heather | University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 343 Amended CCJR FAV.pdf |
JUD |
Gilbert, Patrick | Maryland State's Attorneys' Association | UNF | SB 343 - MSAA Unfavorable.pdf | JUD |
Sydnor III, Charles E. | Senator Charles E. Sydnor III | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony Sen Sydnor_House testimony SB343 -Final.pdf |
JUD |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools