Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0417 - Election Administration - State Administrator, Local Boards, and Election Directors

Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/21/2024 1:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/26/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 6/24/2024 11:53:23 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Hayes, Senator Hayes FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
DeMarinis, Jared FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB417_StateBoardofElections_Support_JaredDeMarinis
EEE
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-02-21 SB417 (Support).pdf EEE
DOrazio, Peter Year UNF No Testimony EEE
Pedersen, Stacy FWA No Testimony EEE
Atkins, Robert UNF No Testimony EEE
Love, William UNF No Testimony EEE
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony EEE
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony EEE
Arshavsky, Svetlana UNF No Testimony EEE
Volkmar, Leslie UNF No Testimony EEE
Lang, Alan UNF 2024 SB0417 Testimony against 2024-02-21.pdf EEE
Hayes, Antonio FAV SB 417 Testimony.pdf EEE
Lang, Alan UNF 2024 SB0417 Testimony against 2024-02-21.pdf EEE
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony EEE
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF No Testimony EEE
Antoine, Joanne Common Cause Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 417 - Election Administration - State Administr
EEE
Sirkel, Robin UNF No Testimony EEE
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony EEE
Gallagher, George ICQ FWA No Testimony EEE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-21-2024 at 941 AM EEE
Senator Hayes, Senator Hayes FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
W&M
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-26 SB417 (Support).pdf W&M
Williams, Peggy UNF SB0417 oppose.pdf W&M
Antoine, Joanne Common Cause Maryland FAV SB 417 - Election Administration - State Administr W&M
Lang, Alan UNF 2024 SB0417 Testimony Against 2024-03-26.pdf W&M
Click to return on the top page