Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0516 - Property Tax - Day Care Centers, Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers
Budget and Taxation 2/12/2025 1:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/26/2025 2:15:00 PM
As of: 5/6/2025 3:42:28 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator King, Senator King | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
B&T | |
Klingenmaier, Lisa | Maryland Family Network | FAV | SB 516_MFN_FAV_Morrow_Property_Tax.pdf | B&T |
Hands, Zachary | Maryland State Board of Education | FAV | SB 516 - State Board - SUPPORT.docx.pdf | B&T |
Jahromi, Laura | Children's Opportunity Alliance | FAV | COA_written testimony_SB516 1.29.25 Child Care Pro | B&T |
Hunt, Ethan | Anne Arundel County | FAV | Anne Arundel County _FAV_SB516.pdf | B&T |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FAV | Testimony in support of SB0516 - Property Tax - Da | B&T |
Wieland, Tom | Ritchie Pharmacy , Brooklyn Park, Md. | UNF | No Testimony | B&T |
Peusch, Christina | Maryland State Child Care Association | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 516 final testimony Feb 12 2025 pdf.pdf |
B&T |
King, Senator Nancy | FAV | SB516-King-Sponsor Testimony.pdf | B&T | |
Rice, Robin | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
B&T | |
Munroe, Kecia | Women's Caucus | FAV | Letter_Support_SB516_Womens_Caucus.docx.pdf | B&T |
Colmers, Elly | Compass Advocacy | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SEIU Local 500 - SB516 - Support.pdf |
B&T |
Zentz, Kim | UNF | No Testimony | B&T | |
Bagwell, Ashlie | FAV | 2025 GBCC SB 516 Property Tax Child Care SUPPORT.p | B&T | |
Kinnally, Kevin | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FAV | SB0516-BT_MACo_SUP.pdf | B&T |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-11-2025 at 914 AM | B&T | |
Senator King, Senator King | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FWA | SB0516 crossfile FWA - Property Tax - Day Care Cen | W&M |
Hunt, Ethan | Anne Arundel County | FAV | Anne Arundel County _W&M_FAV_SB516.pdf | W&M |
Colmers, Elly | Compass Advocacy | FAV | SEIU Local 500 - SB516 - Support.pdf | W&M |
Mills, Morgan | Compass Government Relations | FAV | MSCCA_SB516_FAV.pdf | W&M |
Houck, Madeline | Maryland State Department of Education | FAV | SB0516- State Board- Support- Crossover.pdf | W&M |
Cano, Christopher | SEIU Local 500 | FAV | SEIU Local 500 Testimony on SB 516 - 2025.pdf | W&M |
Peusch, Christina | Maryland State Child Care Association | FAV | SB 516 final testimony March 25 2025.pdf | W&M |
King, Senator Nancy | FAV | SB516-King-Sponsor House Testimony.pdf | W&M | |
Kinnally, Kevin | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FAV | SB0516-WM_MACo_SUP.pdf | W&M |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools