Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0600 - Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement

Finance 2/17/2022 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/24/2022 1:30:00 PM
As of: 7/24/2024 3:08:35 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Kelley, Senator Kelley FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Balog, Claudia 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East FAV 2022-Tetsimony-SB600-Residential Service Agencies FIN
Kelley, Delores Md. General Assembly FAV SB 600_Residential Service Agencies.pdf
SB600_SponsorAmendments
FIN
Kauffman, Danna UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0600_UNF_MNCHA_Health Facilities - Residential S
FIN
Rodwin, David Public Justice Center FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
PJC testimony - SB600 - fav.pdf
FIN
Williams, Stephanie FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Palmisano, Anna Marylanders for Patient Rights FAV SB600_Marylanders for Patient Rights_fav.pdf FIN
Viturro, Mariana National Domestic Workers Alliance FAV NDWA Comments SB600 Maryland.pdf FIN
Colchamiro, Eric Alzheimers Association FWA SB600_FWA_AlzheimersAssociationMD.pdf FIN
Bresnahan, Tammy AARP Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 600 Residential Service Agencies Reporting Requ
FIN
Tesfai, Lul New America FAV 02.15.2022 New America Letter in Support of Maryla FIN
Schumitz, Kali Maryland Center on Economic Policy FAV SB600_MD Center on Economic Policy_FAV.pdf FIN
Berezin, Alex Complete Home Care, LLC FAV Complete Home Care - SB600.pdf FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-18-2022 at 832 AM FIN
Senator Kelley, Senator Kelley FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Bresnahan, Tammy AARP Maryland FAV SB 600 Residential Service Agencies Reporting Requ HGO
Kauffman, Danna UNF SB0600 - House_UNF_MNCHA_Health Facilities - Resid HGO
Kelley, Delores Md. General Assembly FAV SB 600_HGO Residential Service Agencies.pdf HGO
Rodwin, David Public Justice Center FAV PJC testimony - SB600 - fav - for HGO.pdf HGO
Palmisano, Anna Marylanders for Patient Rights FAV SB600_Marylanders for Patient Rights_fav.pdf HGO
Balog, Claudia 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East FAV 1199SEIU 2022-Testimony-SB0600-Residential Service HGO
Viturro, Mariana National Domestic Workers Alliance FAV NDWA CommentsSB600 Maryland.pdf HGO
Schumitz, Kali Maryland Center on Economic Policy FAV SB600_MD Center on Economic Policy_FAV.pdf HGO
Colchamiro, Eric Alzheimers Association FAV SB600_FAV.HGO_AlzheimersAssociationMD.pdf HGO
Tesfai, Lul New America FAV 03.22.2022 New America Letter in Support of Maryla HGO
Ames, Randi Disability Rights Maryland FAV SB600-HGO_DRM_FAV.pdf HGO
Click to return on the top page