Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0682 - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gender-Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022)

Finance 2/22/2022 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/24/2022 1:30:00 PM
As of: 9/24/2022 9:07:00 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Washington, Senator Washington FAV Oral Testimony FIN
Talwar, Huck On Our Own of Maryland, Inc. FAV 2022-SB682-FAV-MD Medical Assistance Program Gende FIN
Maxwell, Erin Chase Brexton Health Care-Center for LGBTQ Health Equity FAV Testimony in Support of SB 682-Erin Maxwell.pdf FIN
Neira, Paula Johns Hopkins Medicine / Johns Hopkins Center for Transgender Health FAV Oral Testimony
SB 682 - (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022) JHU-JHM
FIN
Townsend, Pegeen A. MedStar Health FAV SB 682 - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gen FIN
Geddes, Ann Maryland Coalition of Families FAV Oral Testimony
MCF_Fav_SB 682.pdf
FIN
Quinlan, Margo Mental Health Association of Maryland FAV Oral Testimony
SB0682 Gender Affirming Treatment_Trans Health Equ
FIN
Bogdan, Henry Maryland Nonprofits FAV Senate Bill 682 - support - FIN - Gender-Affirmin FIN
Lent, Michael FAV No Testimony FIN
Hoffman, C.P. FAV Oral Testimony
SB682 2022-02-21 Testimony of FreeState Justice to
FIN
Lizama, Sergio FAV Oral Testimony FIN
Harfouch, Omar FAV Support SB2 testimony.pdf FIN
Jefferson , Stacey Behavioral Health System Baltimore FAV SB 682_ Trans Health Equity Act of 2022 _BHSB_FAVO FIN
Washington, Mary Maryland General Assembly FWA SB0682 Amendment -843725-01.pdf
Sen Washington Testimony SB682.pdf
FIN
McDonald, Ericka LWVMD FAV 2_22 SB682 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - G FIN
Lichtel, Nasira FAV Testimony in Support of SB 682.pdf FIN
Kasemeyer, Pam FWA SB0682_FWA_MedChi_Trans Health Equity Act of 2022. FIN
Denkevitz, Jessica FAV SB 682_Jessica Denkevitz_fav.pdf FIN
Williamson, Sam Homeless Persons Representation Project FAV Oral Testimony
SB 682_Homeless Persons Representation Project_fav
FIN
Adachi, Taro private citizen FAV Letter of Support for SB 682 Trans Health Equity A FIN
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0682_Trans_Health_Equity_MLC_FAV.pdf FIN
Davis, Ashley FAV Ashley Davis Senate Testimony.pdf FIN
Diamond, Joanna Health Care for the Homeless FAV Oral Testimony
Health Care for the Homeless - SB 682 FAV - Trans
FIN
Gudlavalleti, Rajani Baltimore Harm Reduction Coalition FAV SB682_FAV_BHRC.pdf FIN
Crank, Jill FAV Testimony in Support of SB 682 Jill Crank CRNP.pdf FIN
Lorenz, Eileen FAV Support SB 682.pdf FIN
Berger, Zackary FAV Testimony in Support of SB 682.pdf FIN
Hedian, Helene FAV Oral Testimony
Written testimony_2.20.22.pdf
FIN
Hebb, John FAV Hebb estimony in Support of SB 682.pdf FIN
Pine, Elyse Chase Brexton Health Care FAV Oral Testimony
Elyse Pine written testimony SB682.pdf
FIN
Schumitz, Kali Maryland Center on Economic Policy FAV Oral Testimony
SB682_MD Center on Economic Policy_FAV.pdf
FIN
Black, Ashley Public Justice Center FAV SB 682_PJC_Favorable.pdf FIN
Fields, Edgar FAV SB0682 testimony.pdf FIN
Leathers, Fiona FAV SB0682_written_testimony.pdf FIN
Stewart, Jordan FAV Trans Healthy Equity Act Testimony- Jordan Stewart FIN
Cox, Cassandra FAV SB682_CassandraCox_Fav.pdf FIN
Burns, Erica FAV Oral Testimony
Written Testimony in Support of SB 682.pdf
FIN
Shycoff, Isabella FAV Testimony for SB 682 - Maryland Medical Assistance FIN
Buchanan, M Kathryn FAV MKB Letter of Support for SB 682 Trans Health Equi FIN
Baker, Kellan FAV Oral Testimony
SB_682_Favorable_BAKER.pdf
FIN
Taccheri, Claudia FAV Oral Testimony
SB 682.pdf
FIN
Scott, Emily St. Mark's Lutheran Church and Dreams and Visions, Baltimore FAV Oral Testimony
Testimony from Pastor Emily Scott.pdf
FIN
Reynolds-Dominguez, Milo FAV Support SB 682 Milo Reynolds-Dominguez.pdf FIN
Lorenz, Erin FAV Trans Med Ins Bill.pdf FIN
Blinder , Lee Trans Maryland FAV Support SB 0682 - Trans Maryland .pdf FIN
Redwine, Keith FAV TransHealthEquityTestimonial_Redwine.pdf FIN
Tiffin, Scott FAV 2022 ACNM SB 682 Senate Bill.pdf
2022 MCHS SB 682 Senate Side.pdf
2022 MOTA SB 682 Senate Side.pdf
2022 Moveable Feast SB 682 Senate Side.pdf
2022 PPM SB 682 Senate Side.pdf
FIN
Dumais, Brige 1199SEIU UHE FAV TransHealthEquityActTestimonyFavorable.pdf FIN
Schuster, Calvin FAV Oral Testimony
Testimony of Calvin Schuster in Support of SB 682.
FIN
Levy, Michele FAV Testimony in Support of SB 682.pdf FIN
Mendoza, Danny FAV Danny_THEA_Testimony.pdf FIN
Miller, Jeremy FAV SUPPORT SB682 JM.pdf FIN
Dumais, Brige End Medical Debt Maryland FAV EMD_THEA_Testimony.pdf FIN
Jefferson , Stacey Marylanders Against Poverty FAV MAP_SB 682_Trans Health Equity Act_FAV.pdf FIN
Repsholdt, Claire TransMaryland FAV SB 682_Claire Repsholdt_Lutheran Clergy.pdf FIN
DeBrosse, Ren FAV DeBrosse SB0628 fav.pdf FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-22-2022 at 1012 AM FIN
Senator Washington, Senator Washington FAV Oral Testimony HGO
Lizama, Sergio FAV testimony of support sb682.pdf HGO
Cox, Cassandra FAV SB682_CassandraDCox_Fav.pdf HGO
Lichtel, Nasira FAV Testimony in Support of SB 682.pdf HGO
Schumitz, Kali Maryland Center on Economic Policy FAV SB682_MD Center on Economic Policy_FAV.pdf HGO
Lent, Michael FAV No Testimony HGO
Jasen, Debi FAV 2022 sb682 testimony pdf.pdf HGO
Taccheri, Claudia FAV SB 682_Claudia Taccheri_fav.pdf HGO
Hoffman, C.P. FAV Oral Testimony
SB682 2022-03-22 Testimony of FreeState Justice to
HGO
Ruth, Laure Women's Law Center of Maryland, Inc. FAV No Testimony HGO
mcavoy, vince UNF SB0682_UNF_opposed_vmcavoy.pdf HGO
Hedian, H Victoria --None-- FAV Testimony on Trans Health Equity Act 3.22.22.pdf HGO
Burns, Erica FAV SB 682_EricaBurns_fav.pdf HGO
Quinlan, Margo Mental Health Association of Maryland FAV SB0682 Gender Affirming Treatment_Trans Health Equ HGO
Townsend, Pegeen A. MedStar Health FAV SB 682 - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gen HGO
Levy, Michele FAV SB 682_Michele Levy_fav.pdf HGO
Miller, Jeremy FAV SUPPORT HB 746 JM.pdf HGO
Diamond, Joanna Health Care for the Homeless FAV Health Care for the Homeless - SB 682 FAV - Trans HGO
Pine, Elyse Chase Brexton Health Care FAV SB 682_Pine_fav.pdf HGO
Love, William UNF No Testimony HGO
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0682_Trans_Health_Equity_MLC_FAV.pdf HGO
Black, Ashley Public Justice Center FAV SB 682_PJC_Favorable HGO.pdf HGO
Washington, Mary Maryland General Assembly FAV Oral Testimony
Sen Washington Testimony SB682 HGO.docx.pdf
HGO
Blinder , Lee Trans Maryland FAV SB 0682 - Trans Maryland .pdf HGO
Williamson, Sam Homeless Persons Representation Project FAV SB 682 HGO_Homeless Persons Representation Project HGO
Baker, Kellan FAV SB_682_Favorable_BAKER.pdf HGO
Click to return on the top page