Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0980 - Natural Resources - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Funding and Grants

Budget and Taxation 3/4/2025 1:00:00 PM
Environment and Transportation 3/26/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/29/2025 2:03:45 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Corderman, Senator Corderman FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
B&T
Brooks, Amanda FAV Letter of Support SB980.pdf B&T
Spedden, Daniel HAGERSTOWN/WASHINGTON COUNTY CONVENTION AND VISITERS BUREAU FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Lift the Cap Testimony.pdf
Senate Bill 980 Support.pdf
B&T
Schlag, Heidi FAV SLR written testimony final.pdf B&T
Anderson Wright, Laura Heritage Montgomery FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MHAC_Legislative One-Pager_2025.pdf
SB 980_HB 1327 Testimony.pdf
B&T
Horowitz, Jonathan Washington County Department of Business Development FAV LOS - SB0980 - 2-14-25.pdf B&T
Perez, Luke College Park Aviation Museum FAV ATHA Testimony Letter - SENATE.pdf B&T
Corderman, Paul Maryland General Assembly FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Bay MHAA Funding Testimony (002).pdf
Final SB 980 - Senator Corderman Testimony.pdf
SB0980-HB1327 Letter of Support - Senator Kramer.p
SB980 HB1327 LOS HCWHA PC.pdf
B&T
Grinder, Vickie Town of Thurmont Office of Economic Development FAV SB0980HB1327.pdf B&T
Lang, Alan FAV No Testimony B&T
Challenger, Lisa Beach to Bay Heritage Area, Inc FAV MHAA SB0980 Testimony.pdf B&T
Ziedelis, Dave Visit Frederick FAV Visit Frederick SB 980 Letter of Support 2.28.25.p B&T
Walker, Lucille Southern Maryland Heritage Area FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Packet of Support from Southern Maryland National
Serenity Farm Inc Senate Testimony.pdf
Small Museums_Senate Testimony.pdf
B&T
Comer, Elizabeth Catoctin Furnace Historical Society, Inc FAV Testimony for critically needed inceased MHAA fund B&T
Shatto, Elizabeth Heart of the Civil War Heritage Area FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Written Testimony SB980 HB1327 LOS HCWHA.pdf
B&T
Collier, Ashley Town of Mount Airy FAV Support for SB0980 HB1327 to Increase MHAA Funding B&T
Folk, Kimberly Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority FAV SB0980 HB13227 Support testimony.pdf B&T
McCoy, Juli Allegany County Chamber of Commerce FAV SB980_Letter_3.2.25.pdf B&T
Wilson, Andrew Maryland Department of Planning INFO MDP SB 980 Written Informational Testimony.pdf B&T
Weiss, Allison Sandy Spring Museum FAV Allison Weiss - Sandy Spring Museum - in support o B&T
Hughes, Elizabeth Maryland Historical Trust INFO MDP SB 980 Written Informational Testimony.pdf B&T
Aldrich, Ann Washington County Historical Trust FAV testimony to Lift the Cap.pdf B&T
Candelaria, Gary Heart of the Civil War Heritage Area FAV Senate Bill 0980.pdf B&T
Shapiro, Aaron Patapsco Heritage Greenway FAV PHG Senate Testimony-SB0980.pdf B&T
Houston, Laura Preservation Maryland FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
SB0980 PresMD FAV.pdf
B&T
Baco, Meagan Anacostia Trails Heritage Area FAV sb0980-favorable-anacostia-trails-heritage-area-20 B&T
Kercheval, Jim GHC FAV SB0980 WCCC Support 2-15-25.pdf B&T
Mitchell, Charles Monocacy National Battlefield Foundation FAV MHAA Testimony SB 980 Feb 2025.pdf B&T
Cole, Molli Rural Maryland Council FAV SB980_RMC_SupportTestimony.pdf B&T
Moore, Tereance Western MD CDC FAV Favorable SB0980:HB1327.pdf B&T
Baco, Meagan Maryland Museums Association, Inc. FAV sb0980-favorable-md-museums-assoc-2025-02-28.pdf B&T
Libber, Matt FAV SB0980 - MTC Testimony.pdf B&T
Anderson, Karrington Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) INFO SB0980-BT_MACo_LOI.pdf B&T
Carty, Brigitte FAV FY26 SB098 Testimony.pdf B&T
Frisby, Erin This Could Go Boom! FAV TCGB! testimony Erin Frisby.pdf B&T
Owings, Gail Eastern Shore Heritage Inc FAV SB980 letter of support.pdf B&T
Rosenfeld, Mallory American Battlefield Trust FAV MHAA Support Letter.pdf B&T
Cox, Jane Chesapeake Crossroads Heritage Area FAV No Testimony B&T
Axilbund, Rebecca Main Street Middletown, MD Inc FAV Testimonial Letter for HCWHA 2.28.2025.pdf B&T
Daniels, Shauntee Baltimore National Heritage Area FAV SB0980 FY26 MHAA Testimony BNHA.pdf B&T
Moss, Reuben National Road Heritage Foundation FAV 2025-02-28-Favorable to SB0980-NationalRdHeritageF B&T
Abuhamada, Nicole Washington County Arts Council FAV SB0980 favorable testimony - Washington County Art B&T
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-3-2025 at 1117 AM B&T
Senator Corderman, Senator Corderman FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ENT
Anderson, Karrington Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) INFO SB0980-ET_MACo_LOI.pdf ENT
O'Halloran, Mike FAV SB980_GCCC_fav HOUSE HEARING (2025).pdf ENT
Walker, Lucille Southern Maryland Heritage Area FAV SMNHA Letter of Support_SB0980_HOUSE Committee.pdf ENT
Wilson, Emily Department of Natural Resources UNF SB0980_DNR_OPP_ENT_3-26-25.pdf ENT
Shatto, Elizabeth Heart of the Civil War Heritage Area FAV Written Testimony SB0980 March 26, 2025 hearing.pd ENT
Shapiro, Aaron Patapsco Heritage Greenway FAV PHG House Testimony-SB0980_March 24.pdf ENT
Carty, Brigitte FAV House - FY 26 SB0980 Testimony.pdf ENT
Owings, Gail Eastern Shore Heritage Inc FAV SB980 letter of support - House.pdf ENT
Rogers, Sarah Ex. Director, Heritage Montgomery FAV HB980_Rogers_FAV ENT
Challenger, Lisa Beach to Bay Heritage Area FAV SB980_Challenger_FAV ENT
Spedden, Daniel Hagerstown/Washington County Visitors Bureau FAV SB980_Spedden_FAV ENT
Click to return on the top page